RBSE Solutions for Class 8 Maths Chapter 5 Vedic Mathematics In Text Exercise is part of RBSE Solutions for Class 8 Maths. Here we have given Rajasthan Board RBSE Class 8 Maths Chapter 5 Vedic Mathematics In Text Exercise.

Board |
RBSE |

Textbook |
SIERT, Rajasthan |

Class |
Class 8 |

Subject |
Maths |

Chapter |
Chapter 5 |

Chapter Name |
Vedic Mathematics |

Exercise |
In Text Exercise |

Number of Questions |
4 |

Category |
RBSE Solutions |

## Rajasthan Board RBSE Class 8 Maths Chapter 5 Vedic Mathematics In Text Exercise

**Page No: 58**

Question 1.

Multiplying the following by Urdhwtirgbhyaam Method

(i) 15 × 12

(ii) 60 × 18

(iii) 71 × 8

(iv) 122 × 4

(v) 706 × 56

(vi) 497 × 173

Solution

(i) 15 × 12

Step 1.

Step 2.

Step 3.

1×1 / 1×2+5×1 / 5×2

Step 4.

1 / 2+5 / 10

Step 5.

1 / 7 /10

Step 6.

Step 7.

Therefore, the required(RBSESolutions.com)product we get

15 × 12 = 180

(ii) 60 × 18

Step 1.

Step 2.

Step 3.

6×1 / 6×8+0×1 / 0 ×8

Step 4.

6 / 48+0 / 0

Step 5.

6 / 48 / 0

Step 6.

Step 7.

Therefore, the required(RBSESolutions.com)product we get

60 × 18 = 1080

(iii) 71 × 8

Step 1.

Step 2.

Step 3.

7×0 / 7×8+1×0 / 1×8

Step 4.

0 / 56 + 0 / 8

Step 5.

0 / 56 / 8

Step 6.

Step 7.

Therefore, the required product we get 71 × 8 = 568

(iv) 122 x 4

Step 1.

Step 2.

Step 3.

1×0 / 1×0+2×0 / 1×4+2×0+2×0 / 2×4+2×0 / 2×4

Step 4.

0 / 0 + 0/ 4 + 0 + 0 / 8 + 0/ 8

Step 5. 0 / 0 / 4 / 8 / 8

Step 6.

Step 7.

Therefore, the required product we get 122 × 4 = 488

(v) 706 × 56

Step 1.

Step 2.

Step 3.

7×0 / 7×5+0+0 /7×6+6×0+0×5 / 0×6+6×5 / 6×6

Step 4.

0 / 35 + 0 / 42 + 0 + 0 / 0 + 30 / 36

Step 5.

0 / 35 / 42 / 30 / 36

Step 6.

Step 7.

Therefore, the required product we get 706 × 56 = 39536

(vi) 497 × 173

Step 1.

Step 2.

Step 3.

4×1 / 4×7+9×1 / 4×3+x 1+9×7 / 9×3+7×7 / 7×3

Step 4.

4 / 28 + 9 / 12 + 7 × 63 / 27 + 49 / 21

Step 5.

4/37/82/76/21

Step 6.

Step 7.

Therefore, the required product we get 497 × 173 = 85981

**Page No: 60**

Question 2.

Find the product of the following

(i) 11 x 15

(ii) 12 x 18

(iii) 19 x 17

(iv) 28 x 22

(v) 51 x 49

(vi) 99 x 96

Solution

(i) 11 x 15

Base = 10

Sub-base = 1 x 10 = 10

Sub-base digit = 10 ÷ 10 = 1

Deviation(RBSESolutions.com)from Sub-base = 11 – 10 = + 1

15 – 10 = + 5

Therefore, the required product of 11 x 15

we get 165

(ii) 12 x 18

Base = 10

Sub-base = 1 x 10 = 10

Sub-base digit = 10 ÷ 10 = 1

Deviation from Sub-base = 12 – 10 = + 2

18 – 10 = + 8

Therefore, the required(RBSESolutions.com)product of 12 x 18

we get 216

(iii) 19 x 17

Base = 10

Sub-base = 1 x 10

Sub-base digit = 10 ÷ 10 = 1

Deviation from Sub-base = 19 – 10 = + 9

17 – 10 = + 7

Therefore, the required product of 19 x 17

we get 323

(iv) 28 x 22

Base = 10

Sub-base = 2 x 10 = 20

Sub-base digit = 20 ÷ 10 = 2

Deviation from Sub-base = 28 – 20 = + 8

22 – 20 = + 2

Therefore, the required(RBSESolutions.com)product of 28 x 22

we get 616

(v) 51 x 49

Base = 10

Sub-base = 5 x 10 = 50

Sub-base digit = 50 ÷ 10 = 5

Deviation from Sub-base = 51 – 50 = + 1

49 – 50 = – 1

= 2499

Therefore, the required product of 51 x 49 we get 2499.

(vi) 99 x 96

Base = 10

Sub-base = 9 x 10 = 90

Sub-base digit = 90 ÷ 10 = 9

Deviation from Sub-base = 99 – 90 = + 9

96 – 90 = + 6

Therefore, the required(RBSESolutions.com)product of 99 x 96 we get 9504

**Page No: 63**

Question 3.

Multiply the following three numbers by formula Nikhilam

(i) 11 x 12 x 13

(ii) 8 x 9 x 10

(iii) 6 x 7 x 8

(iv) 27 x 28 x 29

(v) 98 x 99 x 99

(vi) 51 x 52 x 53

Solution

(i) 11 x 12 x 13

Step 1. Base of 11, 12, 13 = 10

Deviation = 1, 2, 3

Therefore, the required product of Number

11 x 12 x 13 = 1716

(ii) 8 x 9 x 10

Step 1. Base of 8, 9, 10 = 10

Deviation = – 2, -1, 0

Therefore, the required Product of Number

8 x 9 x 10 = 720

(iii) 6 x 7 x 8

Step 1. Base of 6, 7, 8 = 10

Deviation = – 4, – 3, – 2

Therefore, the required Product of Number

6 x 7 x 8 = 336

(iv) 27 x 28 x 29

Step 1. Base of 27, 28, 29 = 20

Deviation = 7, 8, 9

Therefore, the required Product of Number 27 x 28 x 29 = 21924

(v) 98 x 99 x 99

Therefore, the required Product(RBSESolutions.com)of Number 98 x 99 x 99 = 960498

(vi) 51 x 52 x 53

Therefore, the required Product of Number 51 x 52 x 53 = 140556

**Page No: 68**

Question 4.

Division operation using Dhwajank method

(1) 1737 ÷ 21

(2) 37941 ÷ 47

(3) 23754 ÷ 74

(4) 3257 ÷ 74

(5) 7453 ÷ 79

(6) 59241 ÷ 82

Solution.

(1) 1737 ÷ 21

Quotient = 82

Remainder = 15

(2) 37941 ÷ 47

Quotient = 807

Remainder = 12

(3) 23754 ÷ 74

Quotient = 321

Remainder = 0

(4) 3257 ÷ 74

Quotient = 44

Remainder = 1

(5) 7453 ÷ 79

Quotient = 94

Remainder = 27

(6) 59241 ÷ 82

Quotient = 722

Remainder = 37

We hope the given RBSE Solutions for Class 8 Maths Chapter 5 Vedic Mathematics In Text Exercise will help you. If you have any query regarding Rajasthan Board RBSE Class 8 Maths Chapter 5 Vedic Mathematics In Text Exercise, drop a comment below and we will get back to you at the earliest.

Nikita says

Dhwajank methods 1737/21question ka full answer